## Engage NY Eureka Math 4th Grade Module 3 Lesson 38 Answer Key

### Eureka Math Grade 4 Module 3 Lesson 38 Problem Set Answer Key

Question 1.

Express 23 × 54 as two partial products using the

distributive property. Solve.

23 × 54 = (_3__ fifty-fours) + (_20__ fifty-fours)

Answer:

Explanation:

Expressed 23 X 54 = 1,242 as two partial products

using the distributive property

23 × 54 = (_3__ fifty-fours) + (_20__ fifty-fours) and solved

as shown above.

Question 2.

Express 46 × 54 as two partial products using the distributive property. Solve.

46 × 54 = (_6__ fifty-fours) + (_40__ fifty-fours)

Answer:

Explanation:

Expressed 46 X 54 = 2,484 as two partial products using the distributive property

46 × 54 = (_6__ fifty-fours) + (_40__ fifty-fours) and solved as shown above.

Question 3.

Express 55 × 47 as two partial products using the distributive property. Solve.

55 × 47 = ( ____ × _____ ) + ( ____ × _____ )

Answer:

Explanation:

Expressed 55 X 47 = 2,585 as two partial products using the distributive property

55 X 47 = (_5__ forty-seven) + (_50__ forty-seven) and solved as shown above.

Question 4.

Solve the following using 2 partial products.

Answer:

Explanation:

Solved 58 X 45 = 2,610 the following using 2 partial products.

Question 5.

Solve using the multiplication algorithm.

Answer:

Explanation:

Solved 55 X 82 = 4,510 using the multiplication algorithm as shown above.

Question 6.

53 × 63

Answer:

Explanation:

Solved 53 X 63 = 3,339 using the multiplication algorithm as shown above.

Question 7.

84 × 73

Answer:

Explanation:

Solved 84 X 73 = 6,132 using the multiplication algorithm as shown above.

### Eureka Math Grade 4 Module 3 Lesson 38 Exit Ticket Answer Key

Solve using the multiplication algorithm.

Question 1.

Answer:

Explanation:

Solved 43 X 72 = 3,096 using the multiplication algorithm as shown above.

Question 2.

35 × 53

Answer:

Explanation:

Solved 35 X 53 = 1,855 using the multiplication algorithm as shown above.

### Eureka Math Grade 4 Module 3 Lesson 38 Homework Answer Key

Question 1.

Express 26 × 43 as two partial products using the distributive property. Solve.

26 × 43 = (__6_ forty-threes) + (_20___ forty-threes)

Answer:

Explanation:

Expressed 26 X 43 = 1,118 as two partial products using the distributive property

26 X 43 = (_6_ forty-threes) + (_20_ forty-threes) and solved as shown above.

Question 2.

Express 47 × 63 as two partial products using the distributive property. Solve.

47 × 63 = (__7__ sixty-threes) + (_40___ sixty-threes)

Answer:

Explanation:

Expressed 47 X 63 = 2,961 as two partial products using the distributive property

47 X 63 = (__7__ sixty-threes) + (_40_ sixty-threes) and solved as shown above.

Question 3.

Express 54 × 67 as two partial products using the distributive property. Solve.

54 × 67 = (_4__ × _sixty- seven___) + (_50__ × sixty – seven_)

Answer:

Explanation:

Expressed 54 X 67 = 3,618 as two partial products using the distributive property

54 X 67 = (_4__ × _sixty- seven_) + (_50__ × sixty – seven_) and solved as shown above.

Question 4.

Solve the following using two partial products.

Answer:

Explanation:

Solved 34 X 52 = 1,768 the following using 2 partial products.

Question 5.

Solve using the multiplication algorithm.

Answer:

Explanation:

Solved 56 X 86 = 4,816 using the multiplication algorithm as shown above.

Question 6.

54 × 52

Answer:

Explanation:

Solved 54 X 52 = 2,808 using the multiplication algorithm as shown above.

Question 7.

44 × 76

Answer:

Explanation:

Solved 44 X 76 = 3,344 using the multiplication algorithm as shown above.

Question 8.

63 × 63

Answer:

Explanation:

Solved 63 X 63 = 3,969 using the multiplication algorithm as shown above.

Question 9.

68 × 79

Answer:

Explanation:

Solved 68 X 79 = 5,372 using the multiplication algorithm as shown above.