## Engage NY Eureka Math 5th Grade Module 2 Lesson 1 Answer Key

### Eureka Math Grade 5 Module 2 Lesson 1 Problem Set Answer Key

Question 1.

Fill in the blanks using your knowledge of place value units and basic facts.

a. 23 × 20

Think: 23 ones × 2 tens = _____46_____ tens

23 × 20 = ____460______

Answer:

23 x 20 = 460.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

23 ones x 2 tens = 46 tens.

23 x 20 = 460.

b. 230 × 20

Think: 23 tens × 2 tens = ____46 tens______

230 × 20 = ____4600______

Answer:

230 x 20 = 4600.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

23 tens x 2 tens = 46 tens.

230 x 20 = 4600.

c. 41 × 4

41 ones × 4 ones = 164 ___ones_______

41 × 4 = ____164______

Answer:

41 x 4 = 164.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

41 ones x 4 ones = 164 ones.

41 x 4 = 164.

d. 410 × 400

41 tens × 4 hundreds = 164 ___tens_______

410 × 400 = _____161000_____

Answer:

410 x 400 = 16100.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

41 tens x 4 hundreds = 164 tens.

410 x 400 = 16100.

e. 3,310 × 300

___3310___ tens × ___3___ hundreds = 993 ______

3,310 × 300 = __993________

Answer:

3310 x 300 = 993.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

3310 tens x 3 tens = 993 tens.

3310 x 300 = 993.

f. 500 × 600

___5___ hundreds × __6___ hundreds = 30 _____

500 × 600 = ____3000______

Answer:

500 x 6000 = 3000.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

5 hundred x 6 hundred = 30 hundred.

500 x 600 = 3000.

Question 2.

Determine if these equations are true or false. Defend your answer using your knowledge of place value and the commutative, associative, and/or distributive properties.

a. 6 tens = 2 tens × 3 tens

b. 44 × 20 × 10 = 440 × 2

c. 86 ones × 90 hundreds = 86 ones × 900 tens

d. 64 × 8 × 100 = 640 × 8 × 10

e. 57 × 2 × 10 × 10 × 10 = 570 × 2 × 10

Answer:

a. True.

b. false.

c. True.

d. true.

e. false.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

a. 6 tens = 2 tens × 3 tens

6 tens = 6 tens.

b. 44 × 20 × 10 = 440 × 2

44 x 10 = 440 x 20 = 880.

c. 86 ones × 90 hundreds = 86 ones × 900 tens

86 x 900 = 86 x 900.

d. 64 × 8 × 100 = 640 × 8 × 10

64 x 10 = 640 x 8 .

640 x 8 x 10.

e. 57 × 2 × 10 × 10 × 10 = 570 × 2 × 10

57 x 20 x 10 x 10 = 570 x 20.

570 x 20 x 10 = 640.

Question 3.

Find the products. Show your thinking. The first row gives some ideas for showing your thinking.

Answer:

450 x 300 = 135000.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

45 x 3 = 45 x 30. = 12 x 10 = 120.

450 x 30 = (45×10) (3 x 10) = 45 x 3 x 10 x 10 = 450 x 30 = 13500.

Answer:

400 x 5000 = 20,000.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

40 x 5 = 40 x 50. = 40 x 500 = 2000.

400 x 5000 = (4×10) (5 x 100) = 20 x 10 x 100 = 200 x 100 = 20,000.

Question 4.

Ripley told his mom that multiplying whole numbers by multiples of 10 was easy because you just count zeros in the factors and put them in the product. He used these two examples to explain his strategy.

Ripley’s mom said his strategy will not always work. Why not? Give an example.

Answer:

80 x 100 = 8000.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

80 x 100 = 8000.

8 x 1000 = 8000.

Question 5.

The Canadian side of Niagara Falls has a flow rate of 600,000 gallons per second. How many gallons of water flow over the falls in 1 minute?

Answer:

The gallons of water flow over the falls in 1 minute = 3,60,00,000.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

The Canadian side of Niagara falls has a flow rate of 600,000 gallons per second.

1 minute = 60 seconds.

600,000 x 60.

3,60,00,000.

Question 6.

Tickets to a baseball game are $20 for an adult and $15 for a student. A school buys tickets for 45 adults and 600 students. How much money will the school spend for the tickets?

Answer:

The money school spend for the tickets = 9900$.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

Tickets to a baseball game are $20 for an adult and $15 for a student.

A school buys tickets for 45 adults and 600 students.

45 x $20 + 600 x $15.

900 + 9000.

9900.

### Eureka Math Grade 5 Module 2 Lesson 1 Exit Ticket Answer Key

Question 1.

Find the products.

a. 1,900 × 20

Answer:

1900 x 20 = 38,000.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

1900 x 20.

38000.

b. 6,000 × 50

Answer:

6000 x 50 = 30000.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

6000 x 50.

30000.

c. 250 × 300

Answer:

250 x 300 = 75000.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

250 x 300.

75000.

Question 2.

Explain how knowing 50 × 4 = 200 helps you find 500 × 400.

Answer:

50 x 4 = 200.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

50 x 4.

200.

### Eureka Math Grade 5 Module 2 Lesson 1 Homework Answer Key

Question 1.

Fill in the blanks using your knowledge of place value units and basic facts.

a. 43 × 30

Think: 43 ones × 3 tens = _____129_____ tens

43 × 30 = ___1290_______

Answer:

43 x 30 = 1290.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

43 ones x 3 tens = 129 tens.

43 x 30 = 1290.

b. 430 × 30

Think: 43 tens × 3 tens = ____129______ hundreds

430 × 30 = ____1290______

Answer:

430 x 30 = 1290.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

43 tens x 3 tens = 129 hundreds.

430 x 30 = 1290.

c. 830 × 20

Think: 83 tens × 2 tens = 166 ____tens______

830 × 20 = ____16600______

Answer:

830 x 20 = 16600.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

83 tens x 2 tens = 166 tens.

830 x 20 = 1660.

d. 4,400 × 400

______440____ hundreds × _____40_____ hundreds = 176 ____hundreds______

4,400 × 400 = _____176000_____

Answer:

4400 x 400 = 176000.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

440 hundred x 40 hundred = 176 hundredss.

4400 x 400= 176000.

e. 80 × 5,000

____8______ tens × ____5______ thousands = 40 _____thousands_____

80 × 5,000 = ____40000______

Answer:

80 x 5000 = 40000.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

8 tens x 5 thousand = 40 thousand.

80 x 5000 = 40000.

Question 2.

Determine if these equations are true or false. Defend your answer using your knowledge of place value and the commutative, associative, and/or distributive properties.

a. 35 hundreds = 5 tens × 7 tens

Answer:

35 hundreds = 5 tens x 7 tens.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

5 tens x 7 tens = 35 hundreds.

5 x 7 = 35.

b. 770 × 6 = 77 × 6 × 100

Answer:

770 x 6 = 77 x 6 x 100.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

770 x 6 = 77 x 100 x 6.

4620 = 46200.

c. 50 tens × 4 hundreds = 40 tens × 5 hundreds

Answer:

50 tens x 4 hundreds = 40 tens x 5 hundreds.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

50 tens x 4 hundreds = 40 tens x 5 hundreds.

200 = 200.

d. 24 × 10 × 90 = 90 × 2,400

Answer:

24 x 10 x 90 = 90 x 2400.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

24 x 10 x 90 = 90 x 2400.

240 x 90 = 21600.

90 x 2400 = 216000.

Question 3.

Find the products. Show your thinking. The first row gives some ideas for showing your thinking.

Answer:

b. 80 x 5 = 80 x 50 = 40 x 10 = 400.

800 x 500 = (8 x 100) x (5 x 100) = (8 x 5) x 1000 = 40000.

8000 x 50 = (8 x 5) x (100 x 1000) = 400000.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

80 x 5 = 80 x 50 = 40 x 10 = 400.

800 x 500 = (8 x 100) x (5 x 100) = (8 x 5) x 1000 = 40000.

8000 x 50 = (8 x 5) x (100 x 1000) = 400000.

Answer:

d. 673 x 3 = 6730 x 30 = 2019 x 100 = 20190.

6730 x 300 = (673 x 100) x (3 x 100) = (673 x 3) x 1000 = 201900.

63700 x 3000 = (6730 x 1000) x (637 x 10000) = 2019000.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

673 x 3 = 6730 x 30 = 2019 x 100 = 20190.

6730 x 300 = (673 x 100) x (3 x 100) = (673 x 3) x 1000 = 201900.

63700 x 3000 = (6730 x 1000) x (637 x 10000) = 2019000.

Question 4.

A concrete stepping-stone measures 20 square inches. What is the area of 30 such stones?

Answer:

The area of 30 such stones = 600 sq inches.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

A concrete stepping-stone measures 20 square inches.

20 x 30 = 600.

Question 5.

A number is 42,300 when multiplied by 10. Find the product of this number and 500.

Answer:

4230 x 10 = 42300.

Explanation:

In the above-given question,

given that,

A number is 42,300 when multiplied by 10.

500 = 50 x 10.

50 x 10 = 500.